Mahood, Trudy Lynn (CPSO#: 33109)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2002

Summary

Former Name: Mahood-Behse, Trudi Lynn (used until: 06 May 1982 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clinical Institute
P O Box 10034
thunder bay, ontario
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6T6
Phone: (807) 346-4338
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trudy Lynn Mahood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Mahood ( CPSO# 33109 )

Business Address:
Clinical Institute
P O Box 10034
1005 Alloy Drive
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6T6
Phone Number: (807) 346-4338

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 29 Oct 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRUDY LYNN MAHOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHOOD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1982
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2002