Maker, Dara (CPSO#: 79634)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Family Medicine
Women's College Hospital
Family Practice Clinic
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone: (416) 323-6060
Fax: (416) 323-6135
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barry Cayen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Maker ( CPSO# 79634 )
Dr. B. Cayen ( CPSO# 79395 )

Business Address:
Downsview Orthopaedic & Arthritis Centre
3695 Keele Street
2nd Floor
North York ON  M3J 1N2
Phone Number: (416) 479-8969

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARA MAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2005