Makinde, Oluwatomilola Oluwapelumi (CPSO#: 91830)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
FamilyMedicine & Urgent Care Clinic
15 Resolution Drive
Brampton ON  L6W 0A6
Phone: 289 298 5474
Fax: 289 298 5472
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Oluwatomilola Makinde Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Makinde ( CPSO# 91830 )

Business Address:
Family Medicine & Urgent Care Clinic
15 Resolution Drive
Brampton ON  L6W 0A6
Phone Number: (289) 298-5474

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jan 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLUWATOMILOLA OLUWAPELUMI MAKINDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKINDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 09 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 14 Dec 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2012