Malette, Paul Maurice Joseph (CPSO#: 54489)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Jul 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1679 Main Street
Val Caron ON  P3N 1R8
Phone: (705) 897-1018
Fax: (705) 897-2234
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 05 Jul 2018

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Malette’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Malette sexually abused Patient A and engaged disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct towards Patient A, including by kissing and/or attempting to kiss her, by touching her body, including her genital area, in a manner that was sexual and/or inappropriate, by breaching boundaries, and by making inappropriate remarks and remarks of a sexual nature towards Patient A.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 05 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:01 a.m., July 5, 2018, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and
            Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Paul Maurice Joseph Malette:

            Practice Monitor and Patient Log

            (i)   Dr. Malette shall not engage in any professional encounters, in person or
                  otherwise (the "Professional Encounter") with patients of any age in any
                  jurisdiction, unless the Professional Encounter takes place in the
                  continuous presence of and under the continuous observation of a monitor
                  who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College (the
                  "Practice Monitor"), and unless the other requirements provided in this
                  Order are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Malette may not be alone
                  with any patient, for any length of time, during any Professional
                  Encounter, whether or not the parent or guardian of the patient is also
                  present.

            (ii)  At all times, Dr. Malette shall ensure that the Practice Monitor shall:

                  a.    Provide reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                        undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis; 
                  
                  b.    Remain present at all times during all Professional Encounters with
                        all patients;
                  
                  c.    Carefully observe all of Dr. Malette's Professional Encounters with
                        patients including, but not limited to, physical and internal
                        examinations.  It is Dr. Malette's obligation to ensure that the
                        Practice Monitor's view of all of his Professional Encounters with
                        patients, including physical and internal examinations, is
                        unobstructed at all times.  
                  
                  d.    Refrain from performing other functions, except those required in
                        the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as Appendix "B" to the
                        Order, while observing Dr. Malette in all his Professional
                        Encounters with patients;
                  
                  e.    Maintain a log (the "Log") of all Professional Encounters with
                        patients in the form attached as Appendix "C" to the Order;
                  
                  f.    Initial all corresponding entries in the records of patients noted
                        in the Log; and
                  
                  g.    Submit the original Log to the College on a monthly basis
                  
            (iii) Dr. Malette shall maintain a copy of the Log at all times, and shall make
                  it available to the College upon request.

            Notification of Practice Locations

            (iv)  Dr. Malette shall inform the College of each and every location that he
                  practices or has privileges including, but not limited to, hospital(s),
                  clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively the "Practice
                  Location(s)"), within five (5) days of this Order.  Going forward, he
                  shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
                  five (5) days of commencing practice at that location;

            Posting a Sign and Translations

            (v)   Dr. Malette shall post a sign all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                  consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible
                  and secure location, in the form attached as Appendix "D" to the Order
                  that states: "Dr. Paul Malette must not have professional encounters, in
                  person or otherwise, with patients, of any age, unless in the continuous
                  presence of and under the continuous observation of a practice monitor
                  acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr.
                  Malette must not be alone during any professional encounter with any
                  patient. Further information may be found on the College website at
                  www.cpso.on.ca."

            (vi)  Dr. Malette shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in
                  which he provides services, of the sign described in (v) above, in all
                  waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of his
                  Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
                  attached as Appendix "D" to the Order.

            (vii) Dr. Malette shall provide the certified translation(s) described in (vi)
                  above to the College within 30 days of the date of this Order;

            Notifying Patients

            (viii)Dr. Malette shall ensure that each patient with whom he has a
                  Professional Encounter is directly notified, prior to the Professional
                  Encounter, of the details of the restriction described in (i), above. 

            (ix)  With respect to patients that are scheduled at least seven (7) days in
                  advance, Dr. Malette shall ensure that each patient is directly notified,
                  within seven (7) days after the appointment is scheduled, of the details
                  of the restriction described in (i) above.

            Monitoring

            (x)   Dr. Malette shall consent to the College's making appropriate enquiries
                  of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution who
                  may have relevant information in order for the College to monitor Dr.
                  Malette's compliance with the terms of this Order and shall promptly sign
                  such consents as may be necessary for the College to obtain information
                  from these persons or institutions;

            (xi)  Dr. Malette shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of his Practice Locations and to inspections of patient
                  charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor Dr. Malette's compliance with the terms of
                  this Order;

            (xii) Dr. Malette shall consent to the College's providing any and all
                  information to the Practice Monitor that the College deems necessary or
                  desirable in order to assist the Practice Monitor in fulfilling their
                  Undertaking and in order to monitor Dr. Malette's compliance with the
                  terms of this Order;

            (xiii)Dr. Malette shall consent to all Practice Monitors' disclosing to the
                  College, and to one another, any information relevant to this Order,
                  relevant to the terms of the Practice Monitor's Undertaking and/or
                  relevant for the purposes of monitoring Dr. Malette's compliance with
                  this Order; and

            (xiv) Dr. Malette shall consent to the College's providing the Order to any
                  Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location where he practices or has privileges ("Chief(s) of
                  Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the
                  College has that led to this Order and/or any information arising from
                  the monitoring of his compliance with this Order.