Malinowski, Jason Robert Joseph (CPSO#: 73613)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Francis Memorial Hospital
21 St Francis Memorial Drive
Box 130
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Phone: (613) 756-9888
Fax: (613) 756-3180
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Malinowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Malinowski ( CPSO# 73613 )

Business Address:
St. Francis Memorial Hospital
300 - 21 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Phone Number: (613) 756-9888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON ROBERT JOSEPH MALINOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALINOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2001