Maloney, Tshai Nkasi (CPSO#: 97328)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Mar 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St.Christopher Iba Mar Diop Col of Med, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
157 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5C 1X7
Phone: 416-362-8822
Fax: 416-362-8877
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

157 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5C 1X7
Canada
Phone: 416-362-8822
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tshai Maloney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Maloney ( CPSO# 97328 )

Business Address:
157 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5C 1X7
Phone Number: (416) 362-8822

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Mar 2017 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Mar 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Oct 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Tshai Nkasi Maloney may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.