Mamen, Natalie Kirsten (CPSO#: 73947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6435
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3276 St Clair Ave East
Toronto ON  M1L1W1
Canada
Phone: 416-285-3666
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Mamen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mamen ( CPSO# 73947 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Emergency Room
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6435

Business Address:
Emergency Room
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone Number: (705) 789-2311

Business Address:
Providence Healthcare
3276 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 1W1
Phone Number: (416) 285-3666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE KIRSTEN MAMEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAMEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2001