Manolakos, Lauren Shoshana (CPSO#: 95219)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: Reich, Lauren Shoshana (used until: 24 Mar 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705)725-9922
Fax: (705)725-8622
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Manolakos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Manolakos ( CPSO# 95219 )

Business Address:
106 - 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 725-9922

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREN SHOSHANA MANOLAKOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOLAKOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013