Mansour, Yasser Mohamed Aly (CPSO#: 83763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1
4033 HURONTARIO ST
Mississauga ON  L4Z 0E4
Phone: (905) 897 5437
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

C107-3885 Duke of York Blvd
Mississauga ON  L5B 0E8
Canada
Phone: 905-366-4441
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

106-222 DIXON ROAD
Toronto ON  M9P 3S5
Canada
Phone: (416) 850-8947
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2540 postmaster DRIVE
Oakville ON  L6M 0N2
Canada
Phone: (905) 847-5437
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yasser Mansour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Mansour ( CPSO# 83763 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
4033 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L4Z 0B8
Phone Number: (905) 897-5437

Business Address:
C107 - 3885 Duke of York Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5B 0E4
Phone Number: (905) 366-4441

Business Address:
2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 0N2
Phone Number: (905) 847-5437

Business Address:
Suite 106
222 Dixon Road
Toronto ON  M9P 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 850-8947

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASSER MOHAMED ALY MANSOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSOUR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2006