Mao, Cuong Russell (CPSO#: 73391)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
690 Dorval Drive
Suite 300 - 5
Oakville ON  L6K 3W7
Phone: (905) 849-4567 Ext. 5
Fax: (905) 849-4591
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp.
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Palermo Medical Professional Centre
2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 340
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Canada
Phone: (905) 849-4567 Ext. 5
Fax: (905) 849-4591
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

North Oakville Medical Centre
3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 409
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Canada
Phone: (905) 849-4567 Ext. 5
Fax: (905) 849-4591
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Russell Mao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mao ( CPSO# 73391 )

Business Address:
409-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (905) 849-4567

Business Address:
690 Dorval Drive
Suite 300-5
Oakville ON  L6K 3W7
Phone Number: (905) 849-4567

Business Address:
Palermo Medical Professional Centre
Suite 340
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 849-4567

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Oct 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CUONG RUSSELL MAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2005