Marchuk, Yuri (CPSO#: 90047)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Mar 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:National Medical University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Tayfour Campus
Physical Med and Rehab
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone: (519) 257-5184
Fax: (519) 257-5137
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yuri Marchuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Marchuk ( CPSO# 90047 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Tayfour Campus
Department of physical Med and Rehab
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 257-5184


Corporation Name: Naaman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Naaman ( CPSO# 96638 )
Dr. Y. Marchuk ( CPSO# 90047 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Phys Med and Rehabiliation
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 257-5184

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Delaware

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 05 Mar 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 14 Dec 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Yuri  Marchuk may practise medicine independently in physical medicine and
            rehabilitation, only.