Margau, Ryan (CPSO#: 76451)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: (416) 756-6095
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital -
Branson Hospital Site
Department of Medical Imaging
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 633-9420
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

York Radiology Consultants And York
X-Ray Management Limited
Suite 100
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 494-8800
Fax: (416) 494-9257
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Margau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Margau ( CPSO# 76451 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6183

Business Address:
North York General Hospital - Branson Site
Department of Medical Imaging
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5

Business Address:
58 Bannatyne Drive
North York ON  M2L 2P1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN MARGAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARGAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006