Marhong, Jonathan David (CPSO#: 95108)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
P.O. Box 2030
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone: 519-352-6400
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Marhong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Marhong ( CPSO# 95108 )

Business Address:
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
PO Box 2030
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN DAVID MARHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARHONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015