Marinescu, Mihaela (CPSO#: 85240)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Fac De Medicina Generala Din Craiova, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
840 McConnell Avenue, room 2357
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240 Ext. 4428
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mihaela Marinescu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Marinescu ( CPSO# 85240 )

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Suite 2361
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIHAELA MARINESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARINESCU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2011