Marmai, Kristine Louise (CPSO#: 82538)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC
Department of Anesthesia
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor St
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6000
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kristine Marmai Medicine Professional Corporaton

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Marmai ( CPSO# 82538 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus
Department of Anesthesia Room C2-168
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Anesthesia
339 Windermere Road
Room C3-120
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
Room B6-665
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTINE LOUISE MARMAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARMAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2010