Maroun, Jean Alfred (CPSO#: 28778)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:St. Joseph's University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean A. Maroun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 15 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 10 Sep 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018