Martin, Anne Jacqueline (CPSO#: 80755)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Avon Family Medicine Centre
511 Huron Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5T8
Phone: (519) 508-1212
Fax: (519) 508-1240
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anne J. Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Martin ( CPSO# 80755 )

Business Address:
Avon Family Medicine Centre
511 Huron Sreet
Stratford ON  N5A 5T8
Phone Number: (519) 508-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE JACQUELINE MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 2005 to 30 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2006