Martin, Douglas David (CPSO#: 78635)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Hamilton Health Sciences Corp
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46368
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Douglas Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Martin ( CPSO# 78635 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
Hamilton Health Sciences Corp
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS DAVID MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Oct 2002 to 19 Nov 2002
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2003 to 19 Jan 2004
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 2004 to 09 Mar 2004
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jan 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2004