Martyniak, Karolina Agata (CPSO#: 93436)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Colborne Family Medical Centre
612 Colborne Street
London ON  N6B 2V2
Phone: (519) 673-1962
Fax: (519) 673-3758
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martyniak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Martyniak ( CPSO# 93596 )
Dr. K. Martyniak ( CPSO# 93436 )

Business Address:
Colborne family Medical Centre
612 Colborne Street
London ON  N6B 2V2
Phone Number: (519) 673-1962

Business Address:
200 - 785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAROLINA AGATA MARTYNIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTYNIAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014