Mashaly, Marwan Khairy Muhammad Bahgat (CPSO#: 94114)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alexandria, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Health Clinic
300 Rossland Road East
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone: 905-239-7663
Fax: (905) 239-4664
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marwan Mashaly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mashaly ( CPSO# 94114 )

Business Address:
One Health Clinic
300 Rossland Road East
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone Number: (905) 239-7663

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARWAN KHAIRY MUHAMMAD BAHGAT MASHALY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASHALY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013