Maslowski, Aleksander (CPSO#: 83501)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Bialystok University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maslowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Maslowski ( CPSO# 83501 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEKSANDER MASLOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASLOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2009