Massam, Joanna Lesley (CPSO#: 81138)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: Swinburne, Joanna Lesley (used until: 11 Feb 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clairhurst Pediatrics
1466 Bathurst Street, Suite 201
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone: (416) 531-3331
Fax: (416) 531-1639
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6479
Fax: (416) 756-6152
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 13 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNA LESLEY MASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASSAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2010