Mathew, Paul Kavanakudy (CPSO#: 83622)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Oct 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
B4D - 350 Conestoga Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 624-5999
Fax: (519) 624-1117
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Canada
Phone: (519) 621-2330
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Altum Health
University Health Network
101 - 745 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 0B6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Altum Health
University Health Network
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada
Health Centre
1055 Fountain St N
Cambridge ON  N3H 5K2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mathew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mathew ( CPSO# 83622 )
Dr. J. Mathew ( CPSO# 89787 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2

Business Address:
Suite B4D
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone Number: (519) 624-5999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Aug 2005 to 02 Sep 2005
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Sep 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 09 Oct 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 09 Oct 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 9, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Paul Kavanakudy
            Mathew, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mathew to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. PAUL KAVANAKUDY MATHEW
                                          ("Dr. Mathew)
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Mathew, certificate of registration number 83622, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Mathew, acknowledge that following a public complaint that raised
                  concerns about my surgical practice, the College conducted an
                  investigation bearing File Number 1100680 (the "Investigation") into
                  whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my
                  surgical practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Mathew, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mathew, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program or programs satisfactory to the College in the
                              management of vascular injuries relevant to orthopedic
                              surgical practice;
                  
                        (ii)  a written summary of relevant literature on avoidance,
                              recognition, and management of orthopedic vascular injuries.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mathew, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Mathew, undertake to complete this requirement within three
                        (3) months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that
                        time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Mathew, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mathew, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mathew, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Mathew, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Mathew, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "B". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Mathew, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Mathew, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Mathew, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Mathew, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr. Mathew, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (12)  I, Dr. Mathew, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mathew, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mathew, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Mathew
                              engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in
                              his surgical practice. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Mathew will engage in professional education in the
                                    avoidance, recognition, and management of vascular
                                    injuries.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Mathew, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Mathew, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (15)  I, Dr. Mathew, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Mathew, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff,
                  to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (c)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 9, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Paul Kavanakudy Mathew to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 9, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Mathew engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his surgical practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Mathew will engage in professional education in the avoidance, recognition, and management of vascular injuries.