Mati, Neil Mosa (CPSO#: 66852)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: Mati, Naieal Mosa (used until: 19 Jun 1995 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
1448 Lawrence Avenue East
North York ON  M4A 2V6
Phone: (416) 752-5426
Fax: (416) 752-7332
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2933 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M2K 1E9
Canada
Phone: (416) 499-8338
Fax: (416) 752-7332
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neil Mati Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mati ( CPSO# 66852 )

Business Address:
2933 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M2K 1E9
Phone Number: (416) 499-8338

Business Address:
Suite 202
1448 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4A 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 752-5426

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL MOSA MATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995