Matta, Ihab (CPSO#: 63975)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7681 Highway 27
Unit 13
Brampton ON  L4L4M5
Phone: (905) 790-6644
Fax: (905) 790-6646
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I. Matta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Matta ( CPSO# 63975 )

Business Address:
129 - 140 Great Lakes Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 2K7
Phone Number: (905) 790-6644

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IHAB MATTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1992