Matte, Jeffrey William Laurier (CPSO#: 93271)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Collingwood General & Marine
Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone: (705) 444-8601
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Matte ( CPSO# 93271 )

Business Address:
Collingwood General & Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 21 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY WILLIAM LAURIER MATTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2013