Matthews, Nicola Elizabeth (CPSO#: 92236)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lennox and Addington County
General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone: 6133543301
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

H5 - 310 Bridge Street W
Napanee ON  K7R 0A4
Canada
Phone: (613) 409-8887
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLA ELIZABETH MATTHEWS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATTHEWS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Nov 2009 to 27 Nov 2009
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2017