Maxwell, Brian Edward (CPSO#: 20499)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: For Toronto paitents: Unit 403 265 Yorkland Blvd Toronto ON M2J 1S5 For London paitents: 499 Oxford St E London ON N5Y 3H8
Date Received: 25 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2018