Mazhar, Mir Nadeem (CPSO#: 90168)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
75 CHARLES STREET
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345 5645
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Mazhar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mazhar ( CPSO# 90168 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
166 Division Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3M6
Phone Number: (613) 544-0228


Corporation Name: Khalid Saeed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Apr 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIR NADEEM MAZHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZHAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2009