Mc Auliffe, Niamh Ann (CPSO#: 92340)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 576-0545
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James O'Leary Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. O'Leary ( CPSO# 90213 )
Dr. N. Mc Auliffe ( CPSO# 92340 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesia and Pain Medicine
Room 2212J
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 26 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIAMH ANN MC AULIFFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MC AULIFFE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 24 Feb 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 25 Feb 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 31 Jan 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2015