McCartney, Colin John Lindsay (CPSO#: 73247)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
The Ottawa Hospital
Room B311
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4A9
Phone: (613) 293-2727
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. CJL McCartney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McCartney ( CPSO# 73247 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLIN JOHN LINDSAY MCCARTNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCARTNEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 15 Mar 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Mar 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Mar 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Mar 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 28 Mar 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 28 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2005