McCauley, William Alan (CPSO#: 58170)

Current Status: Active Member - CPSO Staff as of 07 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 76538
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. A. McCauley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. McCauley ( CPSO# 58170 )

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6538

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM ALAN MCCAULEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCAULEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1989