McConachie, David Reid (CPSO#: 59388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300 2
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3W7
Phone: (905) 849-4567 Ext. 4
Fax: (905) 844-4906
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M0L8
Canada
Phone: 905 845 2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David McConachie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. McConachie ( CPSO# 59388 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
300-2 - 690 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3W7
Phone Number: (905) 849-4567

Business Address:
2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 340
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 849-4567

Business Address:
3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 409
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (905) 849-4567

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID REID MCCONACHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCONACHIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1989