McCready, Janine Brenda (CPSO#: 86635)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital, formerly
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6252
Fax: (416) 469-6253
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McCready Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McCready ( CPSO# 86635 )

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6252

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANINE BRENDA MCCREADY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCREADY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011