McDonnell, Conor Gerard (CPSO#: 81454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500 Ext. 7445
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McDonnell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McDonnell ( CPSO# 81454 )

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (647) 501-9158

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jun 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 08 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Mar 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Conor   Gerard   McDonnell   may   practise   medicine  independently  in
            Anesthesiology only.