McElroy, Rosheen Teresa (CPSO#: 82817)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 The Queensway
M6R 1B5
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 5306000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bridgepoint Health
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto, ON
M4M 2B5
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-8252
Fax: (416) 461-5696
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jul 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 12 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSHEEN TERESA MCELROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCELROY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2007