McGillivray, Colleen Frances (CPSO#: 58015)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Lyndhurst Centre
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 6133
Fax: 416-422-5402
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Physical Medicine Clinic
207-390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 764-8558
Fax: (905) 764-8560
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 07 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLLEEN FRANCES MCGILLIVRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGILLIVRAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1988