McGregor-Shaw, Alyson Mary (CPSO#: 74098)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hosp of Eastern Ontario
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2571
Fax: (613) 738-4878
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McGregor-Shaw and Sy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALYSON MARY MCGREGOR-SHAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGREGOR-SHAW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2002