McInnes, Tina (CPSO#: 76370)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: Subissati, Tina (used until: 28 Oct 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McInnes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. McInnes ( CPSO# 76370 )
Dr. M. McInnes ( CPSO# 76508 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 761-4054

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TINA MCINNES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINNES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005