McLean, Carolyn Anne (CPSO#: 32697)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 07 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Sep 2018

Summary

Former Name: Nurse, Carolyn Anne (used until: 21 Jun 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre 800 Commissioners Rd E London, ON N6A 5W9
Date Received: 12 Sep 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 09 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Sep 2018