McLeod, Valerie Louise (CPSO#: 84419)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 7827
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lennox and Addington County
General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Canada
Phone: (613) 354-6511
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

Kingston Dental Anesthesia Clinic
544 Armstrong Rd
Kingston ON  K7M 7N8
Canada
Phone: (613) 546-6865
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Valerie McLeod Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. McLeod ( CPSO# 84419 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Lennox and Addington County
General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-6511

Business Address:
544 Armstrong Road
Kingston ON  K7M 7N8
Phone Number: (613) 546-4814

Business Address:
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Mar 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE LOUISE MCLEOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009