McMurray, Stephen James (CPSO#: 52388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
517 Jowsey Mclean Rd
Elizabethtown ON  K6V 1W5
Phone: (613) 340-3739
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen McMurray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. McMurray ( CPSO# 52388 )

Business Address:
17 Central Avenue East
Brockville ON  K6V 1W5
Phone Number: (613) 342-4386

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN JAMES MCMURRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMURRAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983