McNally, Linda June (CPSO#: 78806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Feb 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L J McNally Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. McNally ( CPSO# 78806 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA JUNE MCNALLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNALLY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2003
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 09 Nov 2006
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 09 Feb 2007

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Nov 2006
Summary:

 On November 9, 2006, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 
 found that Dr. Linda June McNally committed professional misconduct in that she has engaged in an 
 act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, 
 would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 

 
 
1.	The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. McNally(s certificate of 
 registration for a period of six (6) months, three (3) months of which shall be suspended if Dr. 
 McNally successfully completes, at her own expense, the College(s Boundaries Course on the next 
 available date and the College(s Medical Ethics Course by May 9, 2007, and provides proof thereof 
 to the College.  The commencement date for the suspension is November 9, 2006.

 
2.      	The 
 Discipline Committee directs Dr. McNally to appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3.      
 	The Discipline Committee orders Dr. McNally to pay to the College costs in the amount of 
 $2,500.00 within ninety (90) days of the date of this Order.

 
4.    	 The Discipline Committee 
 directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.

Therefore, the certificate 
 of registration in the Province of Ontario issued in the name of Dr. Linda June McNally is 
 suspended effective November 9, 2006 at 11:59 p.m.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 09, 2006

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 3, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)