McVicar, Jason Alan Joseph (CPSO#: 86456)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department Of Anesthesiology
Critical Care Wing 1401
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Fax: (613) 737-8189
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McVicar Quinton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Quinton ( CPSO# 86454 )
Dr. J. McVicar ( CPSO# 86456 )

Business Address:
300 - 100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Critical Care Wing 1401
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON ALAN JOSEPH MCVICAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCVICAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 18 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 19 Aug 2011 to 17 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 18 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2012