Meade, William Marshall (CPSO#: 72690)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jan 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
380 Burnham Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 1T6
Phone: (705) 743-6480
Fax: (705) 743-6481
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Meade Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Meade ( CPSO# 72690 )

Business Address:
146 Oliver Street
Cobourg ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (905) 653-1140

Business Address:
Northumberland Hospital
1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
Kwartha Urology
Unit 101
380 Burnham Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 1T6
Phone Number: (705) 743-6480

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 31 Dec 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM MARSHALL MEADE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEADE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
Elective Trainee - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1999