Meggison, Hilary Erin (CPSO#: 76734)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Critical Care Medicine
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
C2264-1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 12723
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. E. Meggison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. H. E. Meggison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Meggison ( CPSO# 76734 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Room C2264
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-2541

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HILARY ERIN MEGGISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEGGISON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Mar 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2010 to 31 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2003