Meghji, Murtaza Mohamedali (CPSO#: 30907)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:University of Leeds, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Meghji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Meghji ( CPSO# 30907 )

Business Address:
309 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 744-1167

Medical Records Location

Address: Belmont Professional Centre 309 - 564 Belmont Ave W Kitchener ON N2M 5N6 Telephone Number (519) 744-1167 Fax Number (519) 744-1168
Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may call or send a written request to the above address to the attention of Dr. M. Abbas.
Date Received: 25 May 2018


Address: Belmont Professional Centre 309 - 564 Belmont Ave Kitchener, ON N2M 5N6 Tel: 519-744-1167
Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may call or send a written request to the above address to the attention of Dr. A. Merali.
Date Received: 04 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 07 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018