Meikleham, Simone Aline (CPSO#: 67822)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 549
15 Meredith St East
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Phone: (705) 368-2450
Fax: 705-368-2480
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simone A. Meikleham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Meikleham ( CPSO# 67822 )

Business Address:
15 Meredith Street East
Box 549
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 368-2450

Business Address:
17 Rainbow Ridge Road
Little Current ON  P0P 1A0
Phone Number: (705) 285-4354

Business Address:
16A Complex Drive
Box 101
Wikwemikong ON  P0P 2J0
Phone Number: (705) 859-3166

Business Address:
11 Meredith Street East
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 368-2300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMONE ALINE MEIKLEHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEIKLEHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996