Meloche, Jennifer Lynn (CPSO#: 100174)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905)848-7100
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M2N1
Canada
Phone: (905)813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LYNN MELOCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MELOCHE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 06 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014