Mercer, Deanna Marie (CPSO#: 58605)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 1988

Summary

Former Name: Krasilczuk, Deanna Marie (used until: 14 Jul 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4581
Fax: 613 761 5328
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1355 Bank Street suite 301
Ottawa ON  K1H8K7
Canada
Phone: 613 737 7791
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jay Mercer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mercer ( CPSO# 66552 )
Dr. D. Mercer ( CPSO# 58605 )

Business Address:
Bruyere Family Medicine Centre
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 241-3344

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEANNA MARIE MERCER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1988